EP0057325 - Epoxy-coating composition containing a hardener and an accelerator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufman, Marvin Leonard 129 Chelsea Way Bridgewater New Jersey / US | [1982/32] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1983/26] | West, Alan Harry Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | ||
Former [1982/32] | Cooper, John Anthony Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 81306028.2 | 22.12.1981 | [1982/32] | Priority number, date | US19800221610 | 31.12.1980 Original published format: US 221610 | [1982/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057325 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09D3/58, C09D7/12, C08G59/56, C08K5/34 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
C08G59/621 (EP);
C08G59/4021 (EP);
C08G59/42 (EP);
C08G59/686 (EP);
C09D163/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/32] | Title | German: | Härter und Beschleuniger enthaltendes Epoxyharz-Überzugsmittel | [1982/32] | English: | Epoxy-coating composition containing a hardener and an accelerator | [1982/32] | French: | Composition de revêtement époxy contenant un durcisseur et un accélérateur | [1982/32] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 12.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/11] | 11.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.11.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/29] | 18.01.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1215683 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) |