EP0033695 - Device for applying a canvass to a frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.08.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHAUSSURES HELENE S.A.R.L. Zone Industielle 8, Rue Denis Papin 77390 Verneuil L'Etang / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | For all designated states CHAUSSURES HELENE S.A.R.L. Zone Industielle 8, Rue Denis Papin F-77390 Verneuil L'Etang / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chahantian, André 10, rue de la Carpe F-94140 Alfortville / FR | [1981/32] | Representative(s) | Viard, Jean Cabinet Madeuf-Viard 56A, Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | Viard, Jean Cabinet VIARD 28 bis, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400144.2 | 30.01.1981 | [1981/32] | Priority number, date | FR19800001979 | 30.01.1980 Original published format: FR 8001979 | FR19800025418 | 01.12.1980 Original published format: FR 8025418 | [1981/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0033695 | Date: | 12.08.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0033695 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B44D3/18, B27F7/15 | [1981/32] | CPC: |
B44D3/185 (EP,US);
B27M3/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anbringen einer Leinwand auf einem Rahmen | [1981/32] | English: | Device for applying a canvass to a frame | [1981/32] | French: | Machine de pose d'une toile sur un cadre | [1981/32] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/35] | 21.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/41] | 10.05.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1985 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4180246 (GUY RICHARD [US]); | [A]FR1421612 ; | [A]US3882616 (STARZYK EUGENE J) |