EP0034528 - Expanding mandrel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1985 [1985/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOBLER S.A. MECANIQUE de PRECISION FRANCO-SUISSE 21, Rue de Paris F-95380 Louvres / FR | [1981/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanakaris, Georges 10, rue Alfred de Musset F-93290 Tremblay-lès-Gonesse / FR | [1984/19] |
Former [1981/34] | 01 /
Kanakaris, Georges 10, rue Alfred de Musset F-93290 Tremblay Les Gonesse / FR | Representative(s) | Morash, Daniel 17, Avenue La Bruyère 78160 Marly-le-Roi / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/34] | Morash, Daniel 17, Avenue La Bruyère F-78160 Marly-le-Roi / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400203.6 | 10.02.1981 | [1981/34] | Priority number, date | FR19800003548 | 19.02.1980 Original published format: FR 8003548 | [1981/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034528 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034528 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/40 | [1981/34] | CPC: |
B23B31/4066 (EP,US);
Y10T279/1033 (EP,US);
Y10T279/1041 (EP,US);
Y10T279/24 (EP,US);
Y10T82/268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1981/34] | Title | German: | Spanndorne | [1981/34] | English: | Expanding mandrel | [1981/34] | French: | Mandrin expansible | [1981/34] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/47] | 09.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 26.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2297107 [ ] (LABEYRIE JACQUES [FR]) | Examination | CH117821 | US2397773 | DE2014619 | GB1131092 | US1708228 |