EP0037299 - Synchronisation arrangement for digital information transmitted in packets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1985 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1981/40] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fourcade, Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Dupray, Dominique THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1981/40] | Representative(s) | Turlèque, Clotilde, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud 92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/40] | Turlèque, Clotilde, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400369.5 | 10.03.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | FR19800007015 | 28.03.1980 Original published format: FR 8007015 | [1981/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037299 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037299 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/02 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
H04L7/0337 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1984/16] |
Former [1981/40] | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Synchronisierungsanordnung für blockweise übertragene digitale Nachrichten | [1981/40] | English: | Synchronisation arrangement for digital information transmitted in packets | [1981/40] | French: | Dispositif de synchronisation d'informations numériques transmises par paquets | [1981/40] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 27.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1544612 [ ] (COMMUNICATIONS SATELLITE CORP); | US3613019 [ ] (MURATANI TAKUO, et al); | FR2167259 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]FR2172900 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [ ] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, Boulder, Colorado, 9-11 juin 1969, édité par R.K. SALAMAN New York, U.S.A. K. NOSAKA et al.: "PSK-demodulator with delay line for PCM-TDMA system" pages 37-19 à 37-24 | [ ] - TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RADIO ENGINEERING, vol. 31/32, no. 8, 1977 New York, U.S.A. A.S. GEORGIYEV: "A synchronization system with digital control in high-s peed data transmission" pages 22-24 |