EP0037773 - Backseat for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/41] | Chair, particularly for motor vehicles | ||
[1984/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1985 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1985 [1985/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1981/41] | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 117 à 167, Quai André Citroen F-75747 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prion, Christian Joseph 1, Square Yves du Manoir F-91300 Massy / FR | [1981/41] | Representative(s) | Boivin, Claude 9, rue Edouard-Charton 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | Boivin, Claude 9, rue Edouard-Charton F-78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400504.7 | 30.03.1981 | [1981/41] | Priority number, date | FR19800007794 | 02.04.1980 Original published format: FR 8007794 | [1981/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037773 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037773 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/28, B60N1/10 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
A47C7/285 (EP);
A47C7/32 (EP);
B60N2/3013 (EP);
B60N2/305 (EP);
B60N2/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1981/41] | Title | German: | Rücksitz für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1984/26] | English: | Backseat for motor vehicles | [1984/26] | French: | Siège arrière de véhicules automobiles | [1984/26] |
Former [1981/41] | Stuhl, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | ||
Former [1981/41] | Chair, particularly for motor vehicles | ||
Former [1981/41] | Siège, notamment pour véhicules automobiles | Examination procedure | 26.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 09.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE277877 [ ]; | FR775406 [ ] | Examination | FR2300525 |