EP0037786 - Fuel control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1985 [1985/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BENDIX CORPORATION Executive Offices Bendix Center Southfield Michigan 48037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | For all designated states THE BENDIX CORPORATION Executive Offices Bendix Center Southfield Michigan 48037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuster, Robert W. 123 Parkwood South Bend Indiana 46619 / US | 02 /
Mittendorf, Gerald C. 3623 Brentwood South Bend Indiana 46628 / US | [1981/41] | Representative(s) | Huchet, André, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | Huchet, André, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400555.9 | 07.04.1981 | [1981/41] | Priority number, date | US19800137659 | 07.04.1980 Original published format: US 137659 | [1981/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0037786 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0037786 | Date: | 02.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037786 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/46, F02C9/26 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
F02C9/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1981/41] | Title | German: | Kraftstoffregler | [1981/41] | English: | Fuel control apparatus | [1981/41] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de carburant | [1981/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/41] | 05.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2700872 [ ] (LEE II LEIGHTON); | US2757511 [ ] (JAGGER JAMES H); | US2874540 [ ] (ESMEIER EDWARD F, et al); | US2909896 [ ] (PORTER ROBERT D); | US3075351 [ ] (MCCOMBS JR HOWARD L); | US4033112 [ ] (SCHUSTER ROBERT W); | GB2002852 [ ] (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | FR2404113 [ ] (SNECMA [FR]); | GB2012367 [ ] (SNECMA); | GB2018363 [ ] (DOWTY FUEL SYST LTD) |