EP0043318 - Thermostatic control device for the temperature of a fireplace water heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1988 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 30.03.1988 [1988/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Humbert, Marcel 1, rue de la Nida F-35100 Rennes / FR | For all designated states Helleux, Dominique Chemin du Prieuré F-35230 Saint Armel / FR | [1982/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/01] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 F-35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1982/01] | Le Guen, Louis François 13, rue Emile Bara BP 91 F-35800 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401020.3 | 25.06.1981 | [1982/01] | Priority number, date | FR19800014689 | 26.06.1980 Original published format: FR 8014689 | [1982/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043318 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043318 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F24B9/04, F24B1/187 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
F24B1/187 (EP);
F24B1/183 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/01] | F24B9/04, F24B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/14] |
Former [1982/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Thermostatische Temperaturreguliereinrichtung einer Wasserheizung für offene Kamine | [1982/01] | English: | Thermostatic control device for the temperature of a fireplace water heater | [1982/01] | French: | Dispositif de régulation thermostatique de température d'un appareil de production d'eau chaude de cheminée | [1982/01] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 22.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT, LU | 02.01.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/37] | 20.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.07.1981 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.07.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.1985 | NL | 08.05.1985 | SE | 30.05.1985 | [1988/13] |
Former [1986/45] | AT | 08.05.1985 | |
NL | 08.05.1985 | ||
Former [1986/29] | NL | 08.05.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | GB590221 [ ] (HENRIQUE EMIL MENDELSSOHN, et al); | FR2294400 [ ] (RECH TECH APPLIQUEES [FR]); | FR2393239 [ ] (GIACCONI SILVIO [IT]) | Examination | FR2321092 | FR2333207 |