EP0045698 - Ski brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1985 [1985/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sté. Look Société Anonyme B. P. 72 Rue de la Pique 58004 Nevers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/06] | For all designated states Sté. Look Société Anonyme B. P. 72 Rue de la Pique F-58004 Nevers Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernard, Jean Bât. 1, Résidence "Les Eduens" F-58000 Nevers / FR | 02 /
Le Faou, Daniel 7, Impasse Flaubert Coulanges les Nevers F-58640 Varennes Vauzelles / FR | 03 /
Beyl, Jean 10, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-58000 Nevers / FR | 04 /
Peyre, Henri 88, Avenue Colbert F-58000 Nevers / FR | 05 /
Campillo, Christian 152, rue Voltaire F-58600 Garchizy / FR | 06 /
Guerreau, René Rue Pasteur F-03390 Montmarault / FR | [1982/06] | Representative(s) | Tony-Durand, Serge Cabinet Tony-Durand 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | [1982/06] | Application number, filing date | 81401256.3 | 04.08.1981 | [1982/06] | Priority number, date | FR19800017167 | 04.08.1980 Original published format: FR 8017167 | [1982/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045698 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045698 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A63C7/10 | [1982/06] | CPC: |
A63C7/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI, SE [1982/06] | Title | German: | Skibremse | [1982/06] | English: | Ski brake | [1982/06] | French: | Frein à ski | [1982/06] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/38] | 30.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2308389 (SALOMON & FILS F [FR]); | FR2357274 [ ] (SALOMON & FILS F [FR]); | [A]FR2388573 (TMC CORP [CH]); | FR2400374 [ ] (TMC CORP [CH]); | [A]FR2407726 (SALOMON & FILS F [FR]); | FR2409061 [ ] (MARKER HANNES [DE]); | [A]FR2429026 (TMC CORP [CH]) |