EP0047688 - Method for the opalisation of lamps in a gaseous way [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/11] | Method and apparatus for the opalisation of lamps in a gaseous way | ||
[1983/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.1984 [1984/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/11] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbier, Jean-Paul 18, rue Mansart F-78.330 Fontenay-Le-Fleury / FR | 02 /
Lerouyer, Gilbert Chemin des Ruelles F-78.910 Orgerus / FR | [1982/11] | Representative(s) | Bouton Neuvy, Liliane, et al L'Air liquide, Société Anonyme pour L'Etude et L'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [1982/11] | Application number, filing date | 81401314.0 | 18.08.1981 | [1982/11] | Priority number, date | FR19800019503 | 10.09.1980 Original published format: FR 8019503 | [1982/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047688 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047688 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01K3/00, H01K1/32, H01J61/35 | [1982/11] | CPC: |
H01K3/00 (EP,US);
C03C17/245 (EP,US);
H01J61/35 (EP,US);
H01K1/32 (EP,US);
C03C2217/213 (EP,US);
C03C2218/152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Opalisierung von Lampen durch Niederschlag aus der Gasphase | [1983/48] | English: | Method for the opalisation of lamps in a gaseous way | [1983/48] | French: | Procédé d'opalisation de lampes d'éclairage par voie gazeuse | [1983/48] |
Former [1982/11] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Opalisierung von Lampen in einem gasartigen Weg | ||
Former [1982/11] | Method and apparatus for the opalisation of lamps in a gaseous way | ||
Former [1982/11] | Procédé et dispositif d'opalisation de lampes d'éclairage par voie gazeuse | Examination procedure | 28.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/13] | 04.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.05.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR961085 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | US3352703 [ ] (DOMICONE JOSEPH J, et al) |