EP0046713 - Fluorinated pentene diamine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1986 [1986/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERRELL TORAUDE ET COMPAGNIE 16 Rue d'Ankara 67084 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/09] | For all designated states MERRELL TORAUDE ET COMPAGNIE 16 Rue d'Ankara F-67084 Strasbourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bey, Philippe 8 Rue du Stockholm F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 02 /
Gerhart, Fritz Rheinauerstrasse 14 D-7640 Kehl-Leutesheim / DE | 03 /
Jung, Michel 24 Rue des Vergers F-67400 Illkirch-Graffenstaden / FR | [1982/09] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/09] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81401330.6 | 21.08.1981 | [1982/09] | Priority number, date | GB19800027519 | 23.08.1980 Original published format: GB 8027519 | GB19800037841 | 26.11.1980 Original published format: GB 8037841 | [1982/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0046713 | Date: | 03.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046713 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C101/24, C07C87/26, A61K31/13, A61K31/195, C07C99/00, C07C85/20 | [1982/09] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07C271/20 (EP,US);
C07C43/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/09] | Title | German: | Fluorierte Derivate von Pentendiamin | [1982/09] | English: | Fluorinated pentene diamine derivatives | [1982/09] | French: | Dérivés fluorés de pentènediamine | [1982/09] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/45] | 30.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4134918 [ ] (BEY PHILIPPE, et al); | GB2001960 [ ] (MERRELL TORAUDE & CO); | EP0024965 [ ] (MERRELL TORAUDE & CO [FR]) |