EP0048651 - Surf board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.1983 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIBERT SA. Centr'Alp, 1343, Rue Aristide Bergès 38340 Voreppe / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states ALLIBERT S.A. Société anonyme dite: 129, avenue Léon Blum F-38042 Grenoble Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornou, Jean allée des Bouleaux F-91370 Verriers Le Buisson / FR | 02 /
Hemery, André 25, Domaine de la Courcanne F-27700 Les Andelys / FR | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Lerner, François 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | Lerner, François 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401374.4 | 01.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | FR19800020357 | 22.09.1980 Original published format: FR 8020357 | [1982/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048651 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B63B5/24 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
B63B32/57 (EP);
B63B32/40 (EP);
B63B32/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1982/13] | Title | German: | Segelbrett | [1982/13] | English: | Surf board | [1982/13] | French: | Planche à voile | [1982/13] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/23] | 10.03.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2168041 [ ] (STOBERL ING HELMUT [DE]); | US3871043 [ ] (DAVIDSON SAMUEL L, et al); | DE2850342 [ ] (BLECH SIEGFRIED); | FR2449588 [ ] (AUBRY JEAN) |