EP0048663 - Office machine for data entry or information processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/13] | Office machine for data entry or information processing with a CRT or the like as display | ||
[1985/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.1986 [1986/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE INTERNATIONALE POUR L'INFORMATIQUE CII - HONEYWELL BULL (dite CII-HB) 94, avenue Gambetta 75020 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE INTERNATIONALE POUR L'INFORMATIQUE CII - HONEYWELL BULL (dite CII-HB) 94, avenue Gambetta F-75020 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Pommery, Bertrand J. M. C. H. 94, avenue Gambetta F-75020 Paris / FR | 02 /
Ugon, Michel 94, avenue Gambetta F-75020 Paris / FR | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Doireau, Marc Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA, Poste Courrier: LV59C18, 68 route de Versaillles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | Doireau, Marc Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA, Poste Courrier: LV59C18, 68 route de Versaillles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401432.0 | 14.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | FR19800019954 | 16.09.1980 Original published format: FR 8019954 | [1982/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048663 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048663 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, IT, LI, SE [1982/13] | Title | German: | Büroanlage zur Dateneingabe oder -verarbeitung | [1985/15] | English: | Office machine for data entry or information processing | [1985/15] | French: | Machine de bureau pour l'acquisition de données ou le traitement de l'information | [1985/15] |
Former [1982/13] | Büroanlage zur Dateneingabe oder -verarbeitung mit CRT oder dgl. als Sichtanzeige | ||
Former [1982/13] | Office machine for data entry or information processing with a CRT or the like as display | ||
Former [1982/13] | Machine de bureau pour l'acquisition de données ou le traitement de l'information ayant un écran cathodique ou similaire pour l'affichage | Examination procedure | 19.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/30] | 14.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2011671 ; | [X]DE2354042 ; | US3978328 [ ]; | DE2750810 [ ]; | US4139893 [ ]; | GB2020869 [ ] | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 21, no. 1, juin 1978 New York, US KUHAR: "Multiplexed-Coaxial Wire Bidirectional Display Terminal System", pages 53-59 | Examination | FR2483657 | EP0048662 |