EP0050567 - Method of and device for damping vibrations of a railway wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.03.1986 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE FRANCAISE DES ACIERS SPECIAUX 8 rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | [1982/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pouille, Jean 36 avenue Adolphe Geeraert F-59240 Dunkerque / FR | [1982/17] | Representative(s) | Le Brusque, Maurice CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier 75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/17] | Le Brusque, Maurice CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier F-75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401628.3 | 16.10.1981 | [1982/17] | Priority number, date | FR19800022286 | 17.10.1980 Original published format: FR 8022286 | [1982/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050567 | Date: | 28.04.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60B17/00 | [1982/17] | CPC: |
B60B17/0017 (EP);
B60B2900/133 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1982/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Schwingungsdämpfung eines Schienenfahrzeugrades | [1982/17] | English: | Method of and device for damping vibrations of a railway wheel | [1982/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'insonorisation d'une roue de chemin de fer | [1982/17] | File destroyed: | 02.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 29.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/20] | 21.12.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB445124 [ ]; | US3080771 [ ]; | FR1036943 [ ]; | US2605132 [ ]; | US1852538 [ ]; | DE43128 [ ]; | US1813820 [ ]; | EP0034911 [ ] |