EP0053986 - Bandpass filter tunable to a predetermined number of discrete frequencies in a broad frequency band [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beauquet, Gilles 8, rue Courteline F-22000 Saint Brieuc / FR | 02 /
Devarhubli, Vasudéo 5, allée de l'Etang F-94260 Fresnes / FR | 03 /
Dubost, Gérard 3, avenue Aristide Briand F-35000 Rennes / FR | 04 /
Nicolas, Michel Jacques Robert 142, boulevard Masséna F-75017 Paris / FR | [1982/24] | Representative(s) | Moinat, François, et al S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 91003 Evry Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | Moinat, François, et al S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 F-91003 Evry Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401956.8 | 09.12.1981 | [1982/24] | Priority number, date | FR19800026217 | 10.12.1980 Original published format: FR 8026217 | [1982/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0053986 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0053986 | Date: | 21.07.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/202 | [1982/24] | CPC: |
H01P1/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/24] | Title | German: | Bandpassfilter, welches auf eine bestimmte Anzahl einzelner Frequenzen in einem breiten Frequenzbereich abstimmbar ist | [1982/24] | English: | Bandpass filter tunable to a predetermined number of discrete frequencies in a broad frequency band | [1982/24] | French: | Filtre passe-bande accordable sur un nombre prédéterminé de fréquences discrètes réparties dans une large bande de fréquence | [1982/24] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 15.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 09.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/06] | 22.08.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4004257 (GEISSLER ROBERT G); | [Y]US3444485 (OKEAN HERMAN C); | [Y]US3927347 (FARNEY GEORGE K) |