EP0055179 - Aminoalkyl pyridine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.1986 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolhofer, William A. Star Route Frederick Pennsylvania 19435 / US | 02 /
Hoffman, Jacob M. Pennbrooke Gardens Apt. 17A, Church Road North Wales Pennsylvania 19454 / US | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1982/40] | Corre, Jacques Denis Paul Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1982/26] | Corre, Jacques Denis Paul Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81402021.0 | 17.12.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | US19800218606 | 22.12.1980 Original published format: US 218606 | US19810306441 | 29.09.1981 Original published format: US 306441 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0055179 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/70, C07D213/64, C07D213/32, C07D213/75, A61K31/44, // C07D213/61, C07D213/74, C07D401/04, C07D401/12 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
C07D213/32 (EP,US);
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D213/70 (EP,US);
C07D213/74 (EP,US);
C07D213/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/26] | Title | German: | Aminoalkyl-pyridin-Derivate | [1982/26] | English: | Aminoalkyl pyridine derivatives | [1982/26] | French: | Dérivés d'aminoalcoyl pyridines | [1982/26] | File destroyed: | 02.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/03] | 21.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 22.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.01.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/27] | 06.02.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1985 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2821410 [ ] (ALLEN & HANBURYS LTD); | DE2441929 [ ] (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | GB1604674 [ ] (ALLEN & HANBURYS LTD); | GB1489879 [ ] (LEO PHARM PROD LTD); | US3920822 [ ] (DURANT GRAHAM JOHN, et al); | GB2038804 [ ] (BRISTOL MYERS CO); | US4128658 [ ] (PRICE BARRY J, et al); | US3905984 [ ] (DURANT GRAHAM JOHN, et al) |