EP0041034 - Delivery system for a pressurized gas reservoir such as a cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/48] | Delivery systems starting from a pressurized gas reservoir such as from a cartridge | ||
[1983/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1984 [1984/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLICATION DES GAZ 173, rue de Bercy F-75012 Paris / FR | [1981/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sivignon, Pierre 22, rue Domer F-69007 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Bondoux, Jean-Paul 87, avenue Berthelot F-69007 Lyon / FR | [1981/48] | Representative(s) | Karmin, Roger, et al Cabinet MONNIER, 142-150, Cours Lafayette, B.P. 3058 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [1981/48] | Application number, filing date | 81420074.7 | 15.05.1981 | [1981/48] | Priority number, date | FR19800011863 | 22.05.1980 Original published format: FR 8011863 | [1981/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0041034 | Date: | 02.12.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041034 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/08, F24C3/14 | [1981/48] | CPC: |
F17C13/084 (EP,US);
F17C2205/032 (EP);
F17C2270/0709 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/48] | Title | German: | Entnahmesystem für einen Druckgasbehälter, z.B. eine Kartusche | [1983/37] | English: | Delivery system for a pressurized gas reservoir such as a cartridge | [1983/37] | French: | Système de prélèvement à partir d'un réservoir de gaz sous pression tel qu'une cartouche | [1983/37] |
Former [1981/48] | Abgabesysteme eines Druckgasbehälters, z.B. eines patronenförmigen Behälters | ||
Former [1981/48] | Delivery systems starting from a pressurized gas reservoir such as from a cartridge | ||
Former [1981/48] | Perfectionnements aux systèmes de prélèvement à partir d'un réservoir de gaz sous pression tel qu'une cartouche | Examination procedure | 29.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 09.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1932313 [ ] (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | FR2208087 [ ] (APPLIC GAZ SA [FR]); | FR2383389 [ ] (APPLIC GAZ SA [FR]); | FR2398962 [ ] (APPLIC GAZ SA [FR]) | Examination | FR1133075 |