EP0040579 - Method and device for the manufacture of hollow bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1982 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARBED S.A. Avenue de la Liberté 19 L-2930 Luxembourg / LU | [1981/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Artois, Fernand 25 rue Federspiel L-1512 Luxembourg / LU | [1981/47] | Representative(s) | Neyen, René ARBED-Recherches Service de la Propriété Industrielle route de Luxembourg 66 L-4221 Esch-sur-Alzette / LU | [1981/47] | Application number, filing date | 81630036.2 | 29.04.1981 | [1981/47] | Priority number, date | LU19800082462 | 19.05.1980 Original published format: LU 82462 | [1981/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040579 | Date: | 25.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/32, B28B1/32, E04H7/18, B65D88/02 | [1981/47] | CPC: |
B65D88/02 (EP);
B28B1/32 (EP);
B28B7/32 (EP);
E04H7/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Hohlkörpern | [1981/47] | English: | Method and device for the manufacture of hollow bodies | [1981/47] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de corps creux | [1981/47] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 29.04.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2732461 [ ]; | BE699460 [ ]; | US3598357 [ ]; | FR1003276 [ ]; | CH458695 [ ]; | FR2359265 [ ] |