EP0049207 - Process for machining the surface of a nickel base superalloy workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/14] | Etchant and process for machining the surface of a nickel base superalloy workpiece | ||
[1984/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1985 [1985/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/14] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fishter, Robert Eugene 43 S.W. 12th Terrace Boca Raton Florida 33432 / US | 02 /
Lada, Henry 3364 Grove Road Lake Park Florida 33410 / US | [1982/14] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1982/14] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 81630055.2 | 23.09.1981 | [1982/14] | Priority number, date | US19800192668 | 01.10.1980 Original published format: US 192668 | [1982/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0049207 | Date: | 07.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049207 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C23F1/00, C09K13/04, C23G1/10 | [1982/14] | CPC: |
C23F1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Behandeln der Oberfläche eines Werkstückes aus einer Superlegierung auf Nickelbasis | [1984/37] | English: | Process for machining the surface of a nickel base superalloy workpiece | [1984/37] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement de la surface d'une pièce en superalliage à base de nickel | [1984/37] |
Former [1982/14] | Ätzmittel und Verfahren zum Behandeln der Oberfläche eines Werkstückes aus einer Superlegierung auf Nickelbasis | ||
Former [1982/14] | Etchant and process for machining the surface of a nickel base superalloy workpiece | ||
Former [1982/14] | Agent de gravure et procédé pour le traitement de la surface d'une pièce en superalliage à base de nickel | Examination procedure | 12.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 11.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3467599 [ ] (PUGLIARISSI ANDREW S); | GB1353960 [ ] (ROLLS ROYCE); | GB1475327 [ ] (OXY METAL INDUSTRIES CORP) |