EP0055205 - Sintered powder metal friction material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.1987 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1987 [1987/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABEX CORPORATION Six Landmark Square P.O. Box 10268 Stamford, Connecticut 06904-2268 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states ABEX CORPORATION Six Landmark Square P.O. Box 10268 Stamford, Connecticut 06904-2268 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lloyd, Herbert W. 82 Smith Hill Road Monsey, NY 10952 / US | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 81630076.8 | 17.11.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | US19800218316 | 19.12.1980 Original published format: US 218316 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0055205 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0055205 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0055205 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
F16D69/027 (EP);
B29C43/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/26] | Title | German: | Reibungsmaterial auf Basis von gesintertem Metallpulver | [1982/26] | English: | Sintered powder metal friction material | [1982/26] | French: | Matériau de friction fritté à base de poudre métallique | [1982/26] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 24.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR71778E (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [Y]FR1485656 (CIE IND DES METAUX ELECTRONIQU); | [A]FR1485676 (FERODO SA); | [Y]FR2168678 (FERODO SA [FR]) |