EP0038779 - Process for the enrichment of SO2 separated from waste gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.1983 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/43] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fattinger, Volker, Dr. Im Lee 39 CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH | 02 /
Bentz, Rolf, Dr. Haltingerstrasse 75 CH-4057 Basel / CH | [1981/43] | Application number, filing date | 81810145.3 | 15.04.1981 | [1981/43] | Priority number, date | CH19800003060 | 21.04.1980 Original published format: CH 306080 | [1981/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0038779 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34, C01B17/60 | [1981/43] | CPC: |
B01D53/507 (EP);
C01B17/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anreicherung von SO2, das aus Abgasen abgetrennt wird | [1981/43] | English: | Process for the enrichment of SO2 separated from waste gases | [1981/43] | French: | Procédé d'enrichissement de SO2, qui est séparé de gaz résiduaires | [1981/43] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/43] | 22.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1930109 [ ] (CHEMICAL CONSTRUCTION CORP) |