EP0063667 - Display stand for jewellery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STOBA AG Tübacherstrasse 12 CH-9326 Horn/TG / CH | [1982/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Droz, François Prairie 46 CH-2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [1982/44] | Representative(s) | Hunziker, Jean Patentanwaltsbureau Jean Hunziker Siewerdtstrasse 95 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | Hunziker, Jean Patentanwaltsbureau Jean Hunziker Siewerdtstrasse 95 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 81810159.4 | 24.04.1981 | [1982/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063667 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063667 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A47F7/02 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
A47F7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/44] | Title | German: | Schaugestell für Schmucksachen | [1982/44] | English: | Display stand for jewellery | [1982/44] | French: | Présentoir de pièce de bijouterie | [1982/44] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 28.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR340775 [ ] (ANDRE FONTAINE [FR]); | [X]FR910300 (HUGUENIN FRERES & CO); | US2549369 [ ] (RAPHAEL EPSTEIN); | [A]CH277509 (ISOPLEX AG [CH]); | FR1061586 [ ]; | DE1561559 [ ] (EFKA WERKE KIEHN GMBH FRITZ) |