EP0043343 - Anchoring pin fitting in the channel of a tooth root [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1985 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Szegvary, Georg, Dr. Buchholz-Strasse 39 CH-8053 Zürich / CH | [1982/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/01] | Representative(s) | Seehof, Michel, et al Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Seehof, Michel, et al Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [1982/01] | Seehof, Michel, et al c/o AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 CH-3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 81810247.7 | 17.06.1981 | [1982/01] | Priority number, date | CH19800004896 | 26.06.1980 Original published format: CH 489680 | [1982/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043343 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043343 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/30, A61C5/08 | [1982/01] | CPC: |
A61C13/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1982/01] | Title | German: | Zahnwurzelkanal-Anker | [1982/01] | English: | Anchoring pin fitting in the channel of a tooth root | [1982/01] | French: | Cheville d'ancrage s'engageant dans le canal d'une racine dentaire | [1982/01] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 28.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 25.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH562605 (SPANG HERBERT); | DE114317 [ ]; | US1479508 [ ] (FREDERICK MAEULEN, et al); | [A]DE845243 (GERLACH HANS DR, et al); | [A]DE1541209 ; | [A]FR894771 ; | [A]FR700397 |