EP0044279 - A method of processing monochrome silver halide material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.1985 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/03] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borg, Thomas George 39 Copperfield Gardens Brentwood Essex / GB | [1982/03] | Application number, filing date | 81810280.8 | 10.07.1981 | [1982/03] | Priority number, date | GB19800023175 | 16.07.1980 Original published format: GB 8023175 | [1982/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0044279 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0044279 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/24, G03C5/26, G03C7/30 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
G03C7/4136 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entwickeln monochromen Halogensilbermaterials | [1982/03] | English: | A method of processing monochrome silver halide material | [1982/03] | French: | Un procédé pour le développement de matériau d'halogénure d'argent monochrome | [1982/03] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1981 | Examination requested [1982/03] | 05.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.06.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/51] | 05.07.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2035302 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]GB2010818 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]US3552966 (KUHN GERHARD, et al) |