EP0045284 - Reinforcing element, method of mounting and application of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOSSARD & STÄRKLE AG Im Göbli CH-6300 ZUG / CH | [1982/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vido, Vladimir Höflirain 21 CH-6030 Ebikon / CH | [1982/05] | Representative(s) | White, William, et al PATENTANWALTS-BUREAU ISLER AG Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [1982/05] | Application number, filing date | 81810309.5 | 27.07.1981 | [1982/05] | Priority number, date | AT19800003912 | 28.07.1980 Original published format: AT 391280 | [1982/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0045284 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0045284 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/04 | [1982/05] | CPC: |
E04C5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/05] | Title | German: | Bewehrungselement, Verfahren zu dessen Verlegung und Verwendung | [1982/05] | English: | Reinforcing element, method of mounting and application of the same | [1982/05] | French: | Elément d'armature, son procédé de montage et application dudit élément | [1982/05] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 25.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/18] | 11.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/13] | 11.10.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB204497 [ ]; | FR2090183 [ ]; | [A]CH335840 |