EP0044822 - Compositions able to separate the erythrocytes from the serum or plasma in blood analysis samples, and the method which uses them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prandi, Luigi 43 P.zza Sordello 46100 Mantova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/04] | For all designated states Prandi, Luigi 43 P.zza Sordello I-46100 Mantova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/04] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1982/04] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al Studio Brevetti e Marchi NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.r.l. 33, Viale Bianca Maria I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 81830122.8 | 17.07.1981 | [1982/04] | Priority number, date | IT19800023609 | 22.07.1980 Original published format: IT 2360980 | [1982/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0044822 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0044822 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/14, G01N33/48 | [1982/04] | CPC: |
G01N33/5002 (EP,US);
B01D43/00 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
C08G77/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L83/04, C08L2666/14 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/04] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen zum Abtrennen von Erythroziten aus Serum oder Plasma in Blutanalyseproben und Verfahren für deren Verwendung | [1982/04] | English: | Compositions able to separate the erythrocytes from the serum or plasma in blood analysis samples, and the method which uses them | [1982/04] | French: | Compositions pour la séparation des érythrocytes du sérum ou du plasma dans les échantillons du sang pour analyse et procédé pour leur utilisation | [1982/04] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/35] | 21.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US3920557 [ ] (AYRES WALDEMAR A); | US3929646 [ ] (ADLER STANFORD L); | US3963119 [ ] (LUKACS MICHEL J, et al); | US3972812 [ ] (GRESL JR CHARLES); | US4101422 [ ] (LAMONT JAMES, et al); | GB2014879 [ ] (CORNING GLASS WORKS); | US4172803 [ ] (ICHIKAWA TOSHIZI [JP], et al); | US4180465 [ ] (MURTY VABILISETTI S [US]) |