EP0043364 - Device for introducing a flexible starter bar into a continuous casting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.09.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Aktiengesellschaft Werksgelände A-4010 Linz / AT | [1982/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [1982/01] | Representative(s) | Wolfram, Gustav Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/01] | Wolfram, Gustav, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 81890098.7 | 12.06.1981 | [1982/01] | Priority number, date | AT19800003411 | 30.06.1980 Original published format: AT 341180 | [1982/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043364 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043364 | Date: | 29.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/08 | [1982/01] | CPC: |
B22D11/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/01] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Einbringen eines flexiblen Anfahrstranges in eine Stranggiessanlage | [1982/01] | English: | Device for introducing a flexible starter bar into a continuous casting machine | [1982/01] | French: | Installation pour introduire un faux lingot flexible dans une machine de coulée continue | [1982/01] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/30] | 18.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.11.1984
10.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE Mannesmann Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer2 Postfach 5501 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.11.1984
10.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE Mannesmann Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer2 Postfach 5501 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | 15.01.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.05.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.05.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.06.1985 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1985/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.02.1984 | NL | 29.02.1984 | SE | 13.06.1984 | LU | 30.06.1984 | DE | 01.03.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 29.02.1984 | |
NL | 29.02.1984 | ||
SE | 13.06.1984 | ||
CH | 30.06.1984 | ||
LI | 30.06.1984 | ||
LU | 30.06.1984 | ||
DE | 01.03.1985 | ||
Former [1989/19] | BE | 29.02.1984 | |
NL | 29.02.1984 | ||
SE | 13.06.1984 | ||
CH | 30.06.1984 | ||
LI | 30.06.1984 | ||
DE | 01.03.1985 | ||
Former [1986/49] | BE | 29.02.1984 | |
NL | 29.02.1984 | ||
CH | 30.06.1984 | ||
LI | 30.06.1984 | ||
DE | 01.03.1985 | ||
Former [1985/23] | BE | 29.02.1984 | |
NL | 29.02.1984 | ||
CH | 30.06.1984 | ||
LI | 30.06.1984 | ||
Former [1985/16] | BE | 29.02.1984 | |
CH | 30.06.1984 | ||
LI | 30.06.1984 | ||
Former [1985/15] | CH | 30.06.1984 | |
LI | 30.06.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2707734 [ ]; | DE2710739 [ ]; | FR2342111 [ ]; | DE2221187 [ ]; | CH525049 [ ]; | FR2345250 [ ] |