EP0055245 - Device for adjusting and coordinating a plurality of injection devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/26] | Method of adjusting and coordinating a plurality of injection devices, and injection device for carrying out the method | ||
[1986/10] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 30.07.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedmann & Maier Aktiengesellschaft Friedmannstrasse 7 A-5400 Hallein bei Salzburg / AT | [1982/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pischinger, Anton, Dipl. Ing. Dr. techn. Amschlgasse 29 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Rathmayr, Heinz Schwarzstrasse 8 A-5400 Hallein / AT | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Kretschmer, Adolf Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. A. Kretschmer Dr. Thomas M. Haffner Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | Kretschmer, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. A. Kretschmer Dr. Thomas M. Haffner Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 81890198.5 | 10.12.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | AT19800006185 | 18.12.1980 Original published format: AT 618580 | [1982/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0055245 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0055245 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0055245 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/28 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
F02M59/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/26] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Einstellung und Gleichstellung einer Mehrzahl von Einspritzeinrichtungen | [1986/10] | English: | Device for adjusting and coordinating a plurality of injection devices | [1986/10] | French: | Dispositif pour le positionnement et la coordination d'une pluralité de dispositifs d'injection | [1986/10] |
Former [1982/26] | Verfahren zur Einstellung und Gleichstellung einer Mehrzahl von Einspritzeinrichtungen und Einspritzeinrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | ||
Former [1982/26] | Method of adjusting and coordinating a plurality of injection devices, and injection device for carrying out the method | ||
Former [1982/26] | Procédé pour le positionnement et la coordination d'une pluralité de dispositifs d'injection et dispositif d'injection pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 22.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.1986
02.02.1987
ADMISSIBLE GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Züricher Strasse12 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | [1987/06] | 03.02.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.04.1987 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 24.04.1987 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1987/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1184664 ; | [A]DE2910622 ; | [A]FR952906 | [A] - J. KASEDORF "Service-Fibel für die Gemischaufbereitung", 1. Auflage, Band 4 "Dieseleinspritztechnik", 1980, VOGEL-VERLAG, Würzburg, Seiten 179-183 |