EP0043378 - INTERNALLY INSULATED EXTRUSION DIE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.1982 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. 23555 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/02] | For all designated states TRW INC. 23555 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLFE, John Raymond, Jr. 524 North Sixth Street Rogers, AR 72756 / US | [1982/02] | Application number, filing date | 81900389.8 | 08.01.1981 | [1982/02] | WO1981US00019 | Priority number, date | US19800110515 | 08.01.1980 Original published format: US 110515 | [1982/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101980 | Date: | 23.07.1981 | [1981/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043378 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/02] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B29D7/02, A01J21/02, B29B1/03 | [1982/02] | CPC: |
B29B9/065 (EP,US);
B29B7/582 (EP);
B29B7/826 (EP);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/345 (EP,US);
B29C48/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1982/02] | Title | German: | EXTRUSIONSDÜSE MIT INNERER ISOLIERUNG | [1982/02] | English: | INTERNALLY INSULATED EXTRUSION DIE | [1982/02] | French: | MATRICE D'EXTRUSION A ISOLATION INTERNE | [1982/02] | File destroyed: | 30.10.1991 | Examination procedure | 06.05.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1982/42] | 06.07.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.10.1981 | FR   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3230582 (HOFFMAN ROBERT E, et al); | [A]US3271822 (RHINO DEL H); | [A]US3436449 (TREU JAMES FREDERICK, et al); | [A]US3452394 (MCNEAL DANIEL R JR); | [A]US3516120 (BRAUN SIEGFRIED, et al); | [X]DE2247148 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [X]DE2517402 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) |