EP0046772 - PACKAGE PROVIDED WITH A MULTI LAYER COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.1982 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULTIVAC SEPP HAGGENMÜLLER KG Bahnhofstrasse 4 87787 Wolfertschwenden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | For all designated states MULTIVAC SEPP HAGGENMÜLLER KG Bahnhofstrasse 4 D-87787 Wolfertschwenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VETTER, Artur Bergstrasse 19 D-8941 Wolfertschwenden / DE | [1982/10] | Application number, filing date | 81900446.6 | 10.02.1981 | [1982/10] | WO1981DE00034 | Priority number, date | FR19800003824 | 21.02.1980 Original published format: FR 8003824 | [1982/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8102416 | Date: | 03.09.1981 | [1981/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0046772 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/10] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/20 | [1982/10] | CPC: |
B65D77/2024 (EP);
B65D81/263 (EP);
B65D2577/205 (EP);
B65D2577/2066 (EP);
B65D2577/2091 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/10] | Title | German: | PACKUNG MIT MEHRLAGIGEM DECKEL | [1982/10] | English: | PACKAGE PROVIDED WITH A MULTI LAYER COVER | [1982/10] | French: | EMBALLAGE POURVU D'UN COUVERCLE A PLUSIEURS COUCHES | [1982/10] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 26.02.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1982/32] | 01.03.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2318666 [ ]; | FR2307719 [ ]; | FR2323594 [ ]; | CH566896 [ ] |