EP0047255 - PAINT APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.1984 [1984/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRYPARIS, Nicholaos 29 Jean Street Woodridge, Qld., 4114 / AU | For all designated states GRYPARIS, John 29 Jean Street Woodridge, Qld., 4114 / AU | For all designated states GRYPARIS, Phillip 29 Jean Street Woodridge, Qld., 4114 / AU | [1982/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/11] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 (Sternhaus) D-8000 München 81 / DE | [1982/11] | Application number, filing date | 81900505.9 | 25.02.1981 | [1982/11] | WO1981AU00025 | Priority number, date | AU19800002531 | 26.02.1980 Original published format: AU 253180 | [1982/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8102397 | Date: | 03.09.1981 | [1981/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047255 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/02 | [1982/11] | CPC: |
B05C17/0232 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1982/11] | Title | German: | ANSTRICHAUFTRAGGERÄT | [1982/11] | English: | PAINT APPLICATOR | [1982/11] | French: | APPLICATEUR DE PEINTURE | [1982/11] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1981 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1981 | Search fee paid | 20.10.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/11] | 01.09.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/11] | 14.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1984/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3159905 [ ] | International search | [XP]AU3962778 ; | [X]AU3697971 ; | [X]GB793619 ; | [A]DE1045870 ; | [X]US3662422 ; | [A]US3394423 ; | [X]US2994899 ; | [A]US2881461 ; | [X]US2929089 |