EP0073750 - AQUEOUS POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1990 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.1990 [1990/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONOCURE PTY. LIMITED 5 Melissa Street Regents Park New South Wales 2143 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states MONOCURE PTY. LIMITED 5 Melissa Street Regents Park New South Wales 2143 / AU | ||
Former [1983/11] | For all designated states STAYBOND PTY. LIMITED 7 Melissa Street Regents Park, N.S.W. 2143 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Kenneth Stanley 95 Bettington Road Dundas, N.S.W. 2117 / AU | 02 /
JARRETT, Kevin George 30 Lawson Street Campbelltown, N.S.W. 2560 / AU | [1983/11] | Representative(s) | Nony, Michel NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Nony, Michel Conseil en Brevets d'Invention 29 rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1983/11] | Nony, Michel Cabinet Nony 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81900508.3 | 27.02.1981 | [1983/11] | WO1981AU00028 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8202894 | Date: | 02.09.1982 | [1982/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073750 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073750 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/44, C08F2/48, C08F2/50, C08F2/54, C09D11/10, C09D3/80 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
C09D4/00 (EP);
C08F2/10 (EP);
C08F2/44 (EP);
C08F2/46 (EP);
C09D11/101 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/54 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/11] | C08F2/44, C08F2/48, C08F2/50, C08F2/54, C08J9/20, C09D11/10, C09D3/80 | Designated contracting states | FR [1983/11] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE POLYMERISIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1983/11] | English: | AQUEOUS POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITIONS | [1983/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES POLYMERISABLES | [1983/11] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1982 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1982 | Search fee paid | 16.11.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 08.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XE]WO8100569 ; | [X]AU2341077 ; | [X]AU2299477 ; | [X]AU7082574 ; | [X]AU4042172 ; | [X]AU1848670 ; | [X]AU4696468 ; | [X]AU6723465 ; | [X]GB1489365 ; | [X]GB1419462 ; | [X]GB1407257 ; | [X]GB1320688 ; | [X]DE2360415 ; | [X]CH606240 ; | [X]CH562283 ; | [X]FR2202923 ; | [X]JPS5330680 ; | [X]JPS5319349 ; | [X]JPS5237946 ; | [X]JPS528092 ; | [X]SU496287 ; | [X]SU476279 |