EP0046803 - PROCESS FOR THE GENERATION OF ELECTRIC POWER DURING PERIODS OF PEAK POWER DEMAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1984 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.1984 [1984/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMMERS, William A. 1015 Melbrook Drive Munster, IN 45321 / US | For all designated states LONGARDNER, Robert L. 5321 Radnor Road Indianapolis, IN 46226 / US | [1982/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/10] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81900886.3 | 25.02.1981 | [1982/10] | WO1981US00226 | Priority number, date | US19800125239 | 27.02.1980 Original published format: US 125239 | [1982/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8102443 | Date: | 03.09.1981 | [1981/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0046803 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F01K1/00, F01K3/00, F01K13/02, F01D15/10 | [1982/10] | CPC: |
F02C6/16 (EP,US);
F01K21/04 (EP,US);
F05D2260/211 (EP,US);
Y02E60/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1982/32] |
Former [1982/10] | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE WÄHREND PERIODEN MIT SPITZENVERBRAUCH | [1982/10] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE GENERATION OF ELECTRIC POWER DURING PERIODS OF PEAK POWER DEMAND | [1982/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE COURANT ELECTRIQUE PENDANT DES PERIODES DE POINTE DE DEMANDE D'ENERGIE | [1982/10] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1981 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1981 | Search fee paid | 21.10.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, LU | 01.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/20] | 10.05.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.03.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/13] | 21.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1984/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.11.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 27.11.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3523192 [ ] (LANG WILLIAM J); | FR2042024 [ ] (DJORDJEVIC BOZIDOR); | DD99415 [ ]; | FR2230864 [ ] (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]); | GB1442632 [ ] (ACRES CONSULTING SERVICES); | GB2000229 [ ] (LUNDBERG R) | International search | [A]US2675672 ; | [A]US3831373 (FLYNT F); | [A]US3868817 (MARION CHARLES P, et al); | [A]US3988897 (STRUB RENE); | [A]US4100745 (GYARMATHY GEORG, et al); | [A]US4150547 (HOBSON MICHAEL J [US]); | [AP]US4202169 (ACHESON WILLARD P [US], et al); | [AE]US4261166 (MAYRHOFER MAXIMILIAN) |