EP0051639 - IMPLANTATION OF VAPORIZED MATERIAL ON MELTED SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1987 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1987 [1987/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, NY 10038 / US | [1983/10] |
Former [1982/20] | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, N.Y. 10038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILFVAST, William Thomas 9 Deer Path Holmdel, NJ 07733 / US | [1982/20] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81901270.9 | 01.05.1981 | [1982/20] | WO1981US00582 | Priority number, date | US19800149234 | 12.05.1980 Original published format: US 149234 | [1982/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8103344 | Date: | 26.11.1981 | [1981/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051639 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051639 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/28 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
C30B31/22 (EP,US);
C23C14/022 (EP,US);
C23C14/48 (EP,US);
C30B1/02 (EP,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/20] | C23C13/00, C23C13/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1982/20] | Title | German: | IMPLANTATION VERDAMPFTEN MATERIALS AUF GESCHMOLZENEN SUBSTRATEN | [1986/50] | English: | IMPLANTATION OF VAPORIZED MATERIAL ON MELTED SUBSTRATES | [1982/20] | French: | IMPLANTATION DE MATERIAU VAPORISE SUR DES SUBSTRATS FONDUS | [1982/20] |
Former [1982/20] | AUFBRINGEN VERDAMPFTEN MATERIALS AUF GESCHMOLZENE SUBSTRATE | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.1982 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.1982 | Search fee paid | 04.01.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/20] | 21.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 22.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3560252 (KENNEDY KURT D); | [AP]US4214015 (STEPHAN HERBERT [DE]) | Examination | FR1493822 | FR1595678 | FR2256962 | EP0033685 | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 9, February 1980, NEW YORK (US), M. BRISKA et al.: "Treating thin films by pulsed ion implantation", page 4107 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 85, June 18, 1980, page 123C15 | - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 36, no. 5, March 1980, NEW YORK (US), W.R. WAMPLER et al.: "Electron beam annealing of ion omplanted A1", pages 366-368 |