EP0055261 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE TREATMENT OF WET PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1986 [1986/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LE JEUNE, Gwénolé Rue du Vignoble F-44450 St. Julien de Concelles / FR | [1982/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/27] | Representative(s) | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/27] | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81901686.6 | 17.06.1981 | [1982/27] | WO1981FR00076 | Priority number, date | FR19800013407 | 17.06.1980 Original published format: FR 8013407 | [1982/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8103629 | Date: | 24.12.1981 | [1981/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0055261 | Date: | 07.07.1982 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0055261 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, C10B53/00, F23G5/00 | [1982/27] | CPC: |
C10B53/00 (EP,US);
B09B3/00 (EP,US);
B30B9/067 (EP,US);
F23G5/0273 (EP,US);
F23G5/444 (EP,US);
F23G2201/20 (EP,US);
Y02W30/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBEREITEN NASSEN MATERIALS | [1982/27] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE TREATMENT OF WET PRODUCT | [1982/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE PRODUITS HUMIDES | [1982/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.1982 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/34] | 05.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.07.1984 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR323293 [ ] (PERREAU L [FR]); | US1740610 [ ] (LENK GUS F); | FR2350550 [ ] (ROUSSEAU LOUIS [FR]); | FR2104443 [ ] (EBARA INFILCO); | US3027854 [ ] (AKERLUND FRED E); | FR2134494 [ ] (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORP); | FR2098378 [ ] (MONSANTO CO); | DE2235255 [ ]; | FR1600245 [ ]; | DE1502151 [ ] (CANNADAY RICHARD L); | [A]FR544993 ; | [A]FR2401978 (ENERGY RECOVERY RES GROUP INC [US]); | [P]US4217175 (REILLY BERTRAM B [US]) |