EP0077328 - MULTI-MASTER PROCESSOR BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1985 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXTRON, INC. 200 Precision Road Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [1983/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIS, Bryan 101 Tally Ho Drive Warminster, PA 18974 / US | [1983/17] | Representative(s) | Newby, John Ross, et al JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/17] | Newby, John Ross, et al J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81901831.8 | 27.04.1981 | [1983/17] | WO1981US00542 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8203931 | Date: | 11.11.1982 | [1982/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077328 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [1983/17] | CPC: |
G06F13/26 (EP,US);
G06F13/372 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/17] | Title | German: | VIELFACHLEITUNG FÜR MEHRERE HAUPTPROZESSOREN | [1983/17] | English: | MULTI-MASTER PROCESSOR BUS | [1983/17] | French: | BUS POUR PLUSIEURS PROCESSEURS PRINCIPAUX | [1983/17] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1982 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1982 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 01.11.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4223380 (ANTONACCIO JOSEPH C, et al); | [A]WO8002608 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [A]EP0003849 (MITRE CORP [US]) | International search | [A]US4096571 (VANDER MEY JAMES E); | [A]US3886524 (APPELT DAREN R); | [A]US3813651 (YAMADA H); | [A]US3810114 (YAMADA H, et al); | [A]US3699529 (BEYERS BILLY WESLEY, et al) |