EP0053172 - IMPROVED METHOD FOR DILUTING A LIQUID TEST SAMPLE AND COMPUTER CONTROLLED DILUTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.1984 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.M. AMERICA, INC. 6449 Franklin Boulevard Sacramento, CA 95823 / US | [1982/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASE, Charles 8712 Celery Court Elk Grove, CA 95624 / US | 02 /
WALTERS, Stephen 5648 Kingswood Dr. Citrus Heights, CA 95610 / US | 03 /
MEADOR, Richard E. 7362 Patero Circle Sacramento, CA 95823 / US | [1982/23] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 81901854.0 | 02.06.1981 | [1982/23] | WO1981US00741 | Priority number, date | US19800155472 | 02.06.1980 Original published format: US 155472 | [1982/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8103476 | Date: | 10.12.1981 | [1981/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053172 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/32 | [1982/23] | CPC: |
G01N1/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1982/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERDÜNNEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITSPROBEN SOWIE COMPUTERGESTEUERTES VERDÜNNUNGSGERÄT | [1982/23] | English: | IMPROVED METHOD FOR DILUTING A LIQUID TEST SAMPLE AND COMPUTER CONTROLLED DILUTING APPARATUS | [1982/23] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE DILUTION D'UN ECHANTILLON D'ESSAILIQUIDE ET APPAREIL DE DILUTION COMMANDE PAR ORDINATEUR | [1982/23] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1982 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1982 | Search fee paid | 27.01.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/23] | 06.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/39] | 27.03.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3197285 (SIDNEY ROSEN); | [A]US3901084 (BRAILSFORD HARRISON D); | [A]US3915651 (NISHI HIROSHI HAROLD) |