EP0052660 - BANDAGE CONTAINING ATTACHMENT POST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1982 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Key Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 50 N.W. 176th Street Miami, Florida 33169 / US | [1982/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLUB, Allyn L. 503 Anastasia Avenue Coral Gables, FL 33134 / US | [1982/22] | Application number, filing date | 81901941.5 | 03.06.1981 | [1982/22] | WO1981US00750 | Priority number, date | US19800156025 | 03.06.1980 Original published format: US 156025 | [1982/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8103423 | Date: | 10.12.1981 | [1981/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052660 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/22] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/00 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
A61F13/0203 (EP,US);
A61K9/7084 (EP,US);
Y10S128/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/22] | Title | German: | VERBAND MIT BEFESTIGUNGSSTIFT | [1982/22] | English: | BANDAGE CONTAINING ATTACHMENT POST | [1982/22] | French: | BANDAGE CONTENANT UNE COLONNE D'ATTACHE | [1982/22] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 03.06.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1982/46] | 03.08.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.03.1982 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 03.03.1982 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 03.03.1982 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 03.03.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 03.03.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 03.03.1982 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 03.03.1982 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2221758 (FRANCIS ELMQUIST); | [A]US3416524 (MEIER WILLIAM G); | [A]US2489675 (WEBB ROBERTS AARON); | [A]US2572641 (CHARLES MANLEY) |