EP0082143 - Melting furnace and method for controlling the melting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/26] | HIGH TEMPERATURE ELECTRONIC FURNACE APPARATUS AND METHODS OF OPERATION | ||
[1986/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENERGY FIBERS INT'L CORP. 1705 Third Avenue Niagara Falls, NY 14304 / US | [1983/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONAGHAN, George J. c/o Geotech Development Corp. 360 Valley Forge Plaza Bldg. King of Prussia Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [1986/39] |
Former [1983/36] | 01 /
MONAGHAN, George J. c/o Geotech Development Corp. 360 Valley Forge Plaza Bldg. Wayne, PA 19087 / US | ||
Former [1983/26] | 01 /
MONAGHAN, George J. 1573 Franklin Lane Wayne, PA 19087 / US | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Kern, Popp, Sajda, v. Bülow & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 Postfach 86 06 24 D-8000 München 86 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | Patentanwälte Kern, Popp, Sajda, v. Bülow & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 Postfach 86 06 24 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81902096.7 | 26.06.1981 | [1983/26] | WO1981US00878 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8300144 | Date: | 20.01.1983 | [1983/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082143 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082143 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/027 | [1983/26] | CPC: |
C03B5/0275 (EP);
H05B3/0023 (EP);
H05B3/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/26] | Title | German: | Schmelzofenanlage und Verfahren zum Kontrollieren des Schmelzens | [1986/39] | English: | Melting furnace and method for controlling the melting | [1986/39] | French: | Four de fusion et procédé pour contrôler la fusion | [1986/39] |
Former [1983/26] | ELEKTRONISCHE HOCHTEMPERATUROFENANLAGE UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1983/26] | HIGH TEMPERATURE ELECTRONIC FURNACE APPARATUS AND METHODS OF OPERATION | ||
Former [1983/26] | APPAREIL DE FOUR ELECTRONIQUE A HAUTE TEMPERATURE ET PROCEDES DE FONCTIONNEMENT | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.1983 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.1983 | Search fee paid | 25.02.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/39] | 26.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.1986 | CH | 24.09.1986 | FR | 24.09.1986 | LI | 24.09.1986 | NL | 24.09.1986 | SE | 30.09.1986 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/22] | AT | 24.09.1986 | |
CH | 24.09.1986 | ||
LI | 24.09.1986 | ||
NL | 24.09.1986 | ||
SE | 30.09.1986 | ||
Former [1989/16] | AT | 24.09.1986 | |
NL | 24.09.1986 | ||
SE | 30.09.1986 | ||
Former [1989/08] | AT | 24.09.1986 | |
NL | 24.09.1986 | ||
Former [1988/37] | NL | 24.09.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | FR1309678 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | GB958312 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | US3429972 [ ] (BUSSY JACQUES MARIE YVES LE CL); | DE2033074 [ ] | International search | [A]US3109045 (SILVERMAN WILLIAM B); | [A]US3580976 (BUSSY JACQUES MARIE YVES LE CL); | [A]US4017294 (SANFORD STEVE DOUGLAS, et al) |