EP0057212 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH QUALITY, WATER ABSORBENT, CELLULOSIC SHEET HAVING HIGH SURFACE-PERCEIVED SOFTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1982 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.1983 [1983/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIM, Yong Woon 5220 Northeast 51st Street Vancouver, WA 98661 / US | [1982/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/32] | Application number, filing date | 81902213.8 | 03.08.1981 | [1982/32] | WO1981US01046 | Priority number, date | US19800176225 | 07.08.1980 Original published format: US 176225 | [1982/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8200485 | Date: | 18.02.1982 | [1982/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057212 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | D21H5/24 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
D21H25/005 (EP);
D21F11/14 (EP);
D21H17/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1982/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOCHQUALITATIVER, WASSERABSORBIERENDER CELLULOSEFOLIEN MIT HOHER OBERFLÄCHENSANFTHEIT | [1982/32] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH QUALITY, WATER ABSORBENT, CELLULOSIC SHEET HAVING HIGH SURFACE-PERCEIVED SOFTNESS | [1982/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE FEUILLE DE CELLULOSE DE HAUTE QUALITE, ABSORBANT L'EAU, ET TRES DOUCE EN SURFACE | [1982/32] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/02] | 30.09.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.05.1982 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 07.05.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 07.05.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 07.05.1982 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 07.05.1982 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2940890 ; | [A]US2683088 ; | [X]US2032645 ; | [A]US1986291 ; | [X]DE2314060 ; | [A]GB852678 ; | [X]AU160293 |