EP0056823 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING STEP-TRANSFER OF AN INFORMATION MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/31] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSADA, Noboru 21-6, Tsunashimanishi 6-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP | 02 /
KANAMORI, Akira 2-61, Kanaichi-cho Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-01 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA, Takashi 7-2-1-408, Arima Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213 / JP | 04 /
MOROTO, Seiro 3-13-1, Sendagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | 05 /
HORIE, Hideo 1199, Hirado-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244 / JP | 06 /
YOSHIZOE, Teruhide 1136, Morooka-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222 / JP | [1982/31] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1982/31] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK Suite 301 Sunlight House Quay Street Manchester M3 3JY / GB | Application number, filing date | 81902246.8 | 30.07.1981 | [1982/31] | WO1981JP00172 | Priority number, date | JP19800105896 | 31.07.1980 Original published format: JP 10589680 | [1982/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8200540 | Date: | 18.02.1982 | [1982/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0056823 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056823 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/09, G11B15/00, G11B15/02, G11B15/46, G11B15/18 | [1982/31] | CPC: |
G11B15/602 (EP,US);
G11B15/02 (EP,US);
G11B15/1808 (EP,US);
G11B20/1816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/31] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUM SCHRITTWEISEN TRANSPORT EINES INFORMATIONSTRÄGERS | [1982/31] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING STEP-TRANSFER OF AN INFORMATION MEDIUM | [1982/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE TRANSFERT PAS A PAS D'UN SUPPORT D'INFORMATION | [1982/31] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.1982 | Translation filed | 22.03.1982 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.1982 | Search fee paid | 22.03.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/31] | 22.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS50125709 ; | [A]JPH04110547B ; | [A]JPH05130770B | [Y] - See Procedings of the IEEE, Vol. 63, No. 8, (1975), JOHN P. HARRIS, et al. "The IBM 3850 Mass Storage System: Design Aspects), p. 1171-1176, Specially P. 1173 | [A] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 22, No. 11 (1980), N.K. ARTER. et al. "Error Recovery in Rotating Head Digital Recorders", P. 5101-5102 | Examination | US3771125 | DE2841106 | US2977047 | JPS4110547B | JPS5130770B | - NAVY TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 4, no. 10, october 1979, WASHINGTON (Columbia USA) J.S. LOMBARDO et al.: "Tape recorder sequenzer system", page 1-8 |