EP0064057 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING PLASTIC CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1987 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAXTER TRAVENOL LABORATORIES, INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [1982/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORTON, William W. 51 Kings Cross Drive Lincolnshire, IL 60015 / US | [1982/45] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/45] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81902547.9 | 08.09.1981 | [1982/45] | WO1981US01195 | Priority number, date | US19800205789 | 10.11.1980 Original published format: US 205789 | [1982/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201682 | Date: | 27.05.1982 | [1982/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064057 | Date: | 10.11.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0064057 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B31B35/60, B31B41/00, B31B1/84 | [1982/45] | CPC: |
A61J1/10 (EP,US);
B31B70/844 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1982/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTERN | [1982/45] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING PLASTIC CONTAINERS | [1982/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE RECIPIENTS EN PLASTIQUE | [1982/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1982 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1982 | Search fee paid | 30.06.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/45] | 15.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 25.02.1983 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 11.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 26.11.1986 | LI | 26.11.1986 | [1989/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB796913 (FENWAL LAB INC); | [A]FR1306328 ; | [A]FR2225351 (THIMONNIER & CIE [FR]) | International search | US3069303 [ ] (SCHOLLE WILLIAM R); | [A]US3283671 (CAMPBELL JR CLAUDE N); | US3868891 [ ] (PARISH FRANK T); | US4027577 [ ] (THOMPSON JOHN A, et al); | [A]US4166412 (VERSTEEGE ARNOLDUS J [NL]) |