EP0060883 - EXERCISE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.1983 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MGI STRENGTH/FITNESS INC. 1026 S. Powell Independence, MO 64051 / US | [1982/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISHER, Milton W. 1201 North Third Street Blue Springs, MO 64051 / US | 02 /
HENSON, Glen E. 3510 South Cottage Independence, MO 64050 / US | [1982/39] | Application number, filing date | 81902847.3 | 29.09.1981 | [1982/39] | WO1981US01314 | Priority number, date | US19800192609 | 30.09.1980 Original published format: US 192609 | [1982/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201138 | Date: | 15.04.1982 | [1982/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060883 | Date: | 29.09.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/39] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A63B23/06 | [1982/39] | CPC: |
A63B21/015 (EP,US);
A63B22/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1982/39] | Title | German: | ÜBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1982/39] | English: | EXERCISE DEVICE | [1982/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF A EXERCICE | [1982/39] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/12] | 29.11.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.06.1982 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1982 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3640530 (HENSON GLEN E, et al); | [A]US3432164 (DEEKS HUGH A); | [X]US2199955 (EUGEN KRUCK); | [X]US4151988 (NABINGER HERMAN G [US]); | [X]FR1565616 ; | [A]US3643943 (ERWIN CURTIS L JR, et al); | [X]US1016729 (BARRETT TIMOTHY R [US]); | [X]US987644 (ONKEN JOHANN [DE]); | [X]US3192772 (TARTER PETER H) |