EP0062061 - ABSORPTION HEAT PUMP AUGMENTED THERMAL SEPARATION PROCESS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 28.06.1989 [1989/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERICKSON, Donald Charles 1704 South Harbor Lane Annapolis, MD 21401 / US | [1982/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/41] | Representative(s) | Thébault, Jean-Louis SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/41] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault S.A. 1 Allées de Chartres F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 81902897.8 | 09.10.1981 | [1982/41] | WO1981US01359 | Priority number, date | US19800195842 | 10.10.1980 Original published format: US 195842 | [1982/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201323 | Date: | 29.04.1982 | [1982/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062061 | Date: | 13.10.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062061 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/14 | [1982/41] | CPC: |
F25B30/04 (EP,US);
B01D3/007 (EP,US);
Y02A40/963 (EP,US);
Y02B30/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/41] | Title | German: | THERMISCHES ABSCHEIDUNGSVERFAHREN UND MIT EINER ABSORPTIONSWÄRMEPUMPE VERSTÄRKTE VORRICHTUNG | [1982/41] | English: | ABSORPTION HEAT PUMP AUGMENTED THERMAL SEPARATION PROCESS AND APPARATUS | [1982/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION THERMIQUE ACCRU PAR UNE POMPE DE CHALEUR A ABSORPTION | [1982/41] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1982 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1982 | Search fee paid | 15.06.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/01] | 19.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.01.1988 | CH | 13.01.1988 | LI | 13.01.1988 | SE | 31.01.1988 | [1989/26] |
Former [1989/21] | AT | 13.01.1988 | |
SE | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 13.01.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1114168 (BAYER AG); | [Y]FR1572711 ; | [Y]FR2440393 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | International search | [X]US2769309 (IRVINE ROBERT L); | [X]US2742407 (IRVINE ROBERT L); | [X]US2726519 (SQUIER FRANK D); | [X]US2826049 (GILMORE FORREST E); | [X]US2909905 (MITCHELL KENNETH G, et al) |