EP0063150 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SLAG ELEMENTS AND DEVICE FOR ITS IMPLEMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1986 [1986/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Aktiengesellschaft Muldenstrasse 5 A-4020 Linz / AT | [1984/40] |
Former [1982/43] | For all designated states Hulek, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Goglerfeldgasse 15 A-4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hulek, Anton Goglerfeldgasse 15 A-4040 Linz / AT | [1985/25] |
Former [1984/40] | 01 /
Hulek, Anton Goglerfeldgasse 15 | ||
Former [1982/43] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Wolfram, Gustav Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Wolfram, Gustav, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1982/43] | Noske, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Hamerlinggasse 19 A-2340 Mödling / AT | Application number, filing date | 81902982.8 | 27.10.1981 | [1982/43] | WO1981AT00027 | Priority number, date | AT19800005281 | 27.10.1980 Original published format: AT 528180 | [1982/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201505 | Date: | 13.05.1982 | [1982/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063150 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063150 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/54 | [1982/43] | CPC: |
B28B1/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON FORMKÖRPERN AUS HÜTTENSCHLACKE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1982/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SLAG ELEMENTS AND DEVICE FOR ITS IMPLEMENTATION | [1982/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ELEMENTS EN LAITIER ET DISPOSITIF POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE | [1982/43] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1982 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 24.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1984 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 21.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1984 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request rejected | 05.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2067313 [ ]; | US2067312 [ ]; | DE2113005 [ ]; | [A]DE815922 |