EP0064513 - BIAS CURRENT REFERENCE CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1987 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1987 [1987/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1982/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHATLEY, Roger Alan 1317 Warrington Drive Austin, TX 78753 / US | [1982/46] | Representative(s) | Ibbotson, Harold Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/46] | Ibbotson, Harold Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 81902994.3 | 23.10.1981 | [1982/46] | WO1981US01423 | Priority number, date | US19800207532 | 17.11.1980 Original published format: US 207532 | [1982/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201776 | Date: | 27.05.1982 | [1982/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064513 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0064513 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/16 | [1982/46] | CPC: |
G05F3/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/46] | Title | German: | POLARISATIONSSTROMREFERENZKREIS | [1982/46] | English: | BIAS CURRENT REFERENCE CIRCUIT | [1982/46] | French: | CIRCUIT DE REFERENCE A COURANT DE POLARISATION | [1982/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1982 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1982 | Search fee paid | 09.07.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/46] | 10.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3922596 [ ] (CAVE DAVID L, et al); | US4009432 [ ] (DINGWALL ANDREW GORDON FRANCIS, et al); | EP0052553 [ ] (EFCIS [FR]) | International search | [A]US3806742 (POWELL M); | [A]US3823332 (FERYSZKA R, et al); | [A]US4032839 (AHMED ADEL ABDEL AZIZ); | [A]US4096430 (WALDRON WESLEY K); | [A]US4135125 (OURA TOSHIO); | [AP]US4281261 (ADAM FRITZ G); | [XE]US4300091 (SCHADE JR OTTO H); | [XE]US4302718 (SCHADE JR OTTO H) | Examination | - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 26, no 23, November 8, 1978, ROCHELLE PARK (US), D. Bingham: "CMOS: Higher Speeds, more drive and analog capability expand its horizons", pages 74-82 |