EP0065958 - FEEDBACK WELDER CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1983 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine Illinois 60067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/49] | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUREK, Dennis J. 395 River View Drive Grafton, WI 53024 / US | 02 /
ASLIN, Michael 7586 Devonshire Dr. Cedarburg, WI 53012 / US | [1982/49] | Application number, filing date | 81903024.8 | 16.10.1981 | [1982/49] | WO1981US01393 | Priority number, date | US19800197412 | 16.10.1980 Original published format: US 197412 | [1982/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201338 | Date: | 29.04.1982 | [1982/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065958 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/49] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/24 | [1982/49] | CPC: |
B23K11/256 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1982/49] | Title | German: | STEUERSYSTEM MIT RÜCKMELDUNG FÜR SCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG | [1982/49] | English: | FEEDBACK WELDER CONTROL SYSTEM | [1982/49] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGLAGE A CONTRE-REACTION POUR MACHINE A SOUDER | [1982/49] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/11] | 30.11.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4001540 ; | [A]US4104724 ; | [T]US4289948 ; | [T]US4302653 |