EP0064991 - A METHOD FOR THE EXCHANGE OF HEAT BETWEEN LIQUID AND AIR AND AN APPARATUS FOR CARRYING THE METHOD INTO EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZEILON, Sten Olof Heimdalsgatan 21 S-261 62 Glumslöv / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | For all designated states ZEILON, Sten Olof Heimdahlsgatan 21 S-261 62 Glumslöv / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/47] | Representative(s) | Lenz, Franz, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | Lenz, Franz, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 81903061.0 | 24.11.1981 | [1982/47] | WO1981SE00340 | Priority number, date | SE19800008235 | 25.11.1980 Original published format: SE 8008235 | [1982/47] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201938 | Date: | 10.06.1982 | [1982/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064991 | Date: | 24.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0064991 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00 | [1982/47] | CPC: |
F28B1/06 (EP,US);
F28D3/00 (EP,US);
F28D9/0087 (EP,US);
F28F21/065 (EP,US);
Y10S165/905 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1982/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUSTAUSCH VON HITZE ZWISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT UND LUFT UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSÜBEN DES VERFAHRENS | [1982/47] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE EXCHANGE OF HEAT BETWEEN LIQUID AND AIR AND AN APPARATUS FOR CARRYING THE METHOD INTO EFFECT | [1982/47] | French: | PROCEDE D'ECHANGE DE CHALEUR ENTRE UN LIQUIDE ET L'AIR ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT L'EXECUTION DU PROCEDE | [1982/47] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1982 | Translation filed | 21.07.1982 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 21.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR623653 [ ] (GUGGENHEIM BROTHERS); | US2616670 [ ] (DER MOLEN ARIE P VAN); | GB190928365 [ ] (TRIPP EDWARD JOHN); | SE328320 [ ] (ROSENBLAD CORP [US]); | DE2347883 [ ] (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE) |