EP0065575 - CU-AG ALLOY SOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1987 [1987/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIKAWA, Masaki 605-19, Masutomi Kasukabe-shi Saitama 344 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Hideaki 672-25, Masutomi Kasukabe-shi Saitama, 344 / JP | 03 /
KISHIDA, Kunio 2-774, Nisshincho Ohmiya-shi Saitama 330 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Chuji 259-3, Ohazaueno Ageo-shi Saitama 362 / JP | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/48] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne Grupe-Pellmann Bavariaring 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81903070.1 | 18.11.1981 | [1982/48] | WO1981JP00338 | Priority number, date | JP19800172965 | 08.12.1980 Original published format: JP 17296580 | [1982/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8202013 | Date: | 24.06.1982 | [1982/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065575 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065575 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/30 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
B23K35/302 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1982/48] | Title | German: | LÖTDRAHT AUS KUPFER-SILBER-LEGIERUNG | [1982/48] | English: | CU-AG ALLOY SOLDER | [1982/48] | French: | BRASURE EN ALLIAGE DE CU-AG | [1982/48] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1982 | Translation filed | 05.08.1982 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1982 | Search fee paid | 05.08.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/48] | 08.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DD40989 [ ] | International search | [Y]JPS509561 ; | [Y]JPS373114B ; | [A]JPS5536034B ; | [Y]US4052531 (STEINE HANS T, et al); | [Y]DE2525488 (CASTOLIN SA); | [A]SU491454 | Examination | JPS509561 | JPS373114B | JPS5536034B |