EP0067877 - ROBOT CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | ||
Former [1982/52] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd 5-1, Asahigaoka, 3-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INABA, Hajimu 3-16, Asahigaoka 5-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 02 /
SAKAKIBARA, Shinsuke Cohpo-Kimikage 6 1-2-12 Naka Kunitachi-shi Tokyo 186 / JP | [1982/52] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/52] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 81903078.4 | 18.11.1981 | [1982/52] | WO1981JP00346 | Priority number, date | JP19800186735 | 30.12.1980 Original published format: JP 18673580 | [1982/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8202435 | Date: | 22.07.1982 | [1982/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067877 | Date: | 29.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/42 | [1982/52] | CPC: |
B25J9/1612 (EP,US);
G05B19/425 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33263 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35543 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45187 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49395 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/52] | Title | German: | ROBOTER-STEUERSYSTEM | [1982/52] | English: | ROBOT CONTROL SYSTEM | [1982/52] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'UN ROBOT | [1982/52] | File destroyed: | 01.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1982 | Translation filed | 14.09.1982 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1982 | Search fee paid | 14.09.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/52] | 29.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.09.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/31] | 25.02.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1987 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4163183 (DUNNE MAURICE J [US], et al) | International search | [Y]JPS49134059 ; | [Y]JPS50112969 |