EP0093109 - ANTIPANIC OPENING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.1984 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.1984 [1984/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARLEBAS, Gérard Georges Eugène 11 avenue Junot 14 Hameau des Artistes F-75018 Paris / FR | For all designated states PARLEBAS, Solange, née LEBARS 11 avenue Junot 14 Hameau des Artistes F-75018 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states PARLEBAS, Gérard Georges Eugène 11 avenue Junot 14 Hameau des Artistes F-75018 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states PARLEBAS, Solange, née LEBARS 11 avenue Junot 14 Hameau des Artistes F-75018 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/45] | Application number, filing date | 81903095.8 | 06.11.1981 | [1983/45] | WO1981FR00143 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8301644 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | [1983/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0093109 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/45] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/10 | [1983/45] | CPC: |
E05B65/1046 (EP);
E05B65/0025 (EP);
E05B65/1013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/45] | Title | German: | PANIKVERSCHLUSS | [1983/45] | English: | ANTIPANIC OPENING SYSTEM | [1983/45] | French: | SYSTEME D'OUVERTURE ANTI-PANIQUE | [1983/45] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 15.11.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1984/19] | 26.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.08.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 08.08.1983 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 08.08.1983 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 08.08.1983 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 08.08.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 08.08.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 08.08.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.11.1983 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2436869 ; | [Y]US3123387 ; | [E]FR2482649 |